Assembly | 05/19/2022 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2022 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2022 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3671.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2022 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3596.) (May 3). | ||
Senate | 04/18/2022 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2022 | Set for hearing May 3. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |