|
08/22/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 172, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2022
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5756.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2022
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3476.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3204.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|