California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1172 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2022

Amended

Bill June 29, 2022
Bill June 20, 2022