Assembly | 08/31/2022 | Read third time. Refused passage. | ||
Assembly | 06/15/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/14/2022 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 14). | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2022 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2022 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2022 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 3965.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2022 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3787.) (May 19). | ||
Senate | 05/13/2022 | Set for hearing May 19. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2022 | May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2022 | Set for hearing May 2. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3440.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2022 | Set for hearing April 19. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |