06/27/2022 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 39, Statutes of 2022. | |||
06/21/2022 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
06/15/2022 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. | |||
Senate | 06/09/2022 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2022 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 5305.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2022 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 1). | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2022 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2022 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2022 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3476.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3326.) (April 5). | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | Set for hearing April 5. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |