Senate | 05/19/2022 | May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2022 | Set for hearing May 19. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2022 | May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2022 | Set for hearing May 2. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2022 | Withdrawn from committee. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2022 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2022 | April 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Set for hearing April 20. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 3251.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Set for hearing March 29. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and ED. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |