Senate
|
09/19/2022
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2022
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5281.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2022
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/10/2022
|
August 10 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/29/2022
|
August 3 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2022
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3934.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3787.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3542.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|