Senate | 04/19/2022 | April 26 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2022 | Set for hearing April 26 in PUB. S. pending receipt. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | June 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Set for hearing April 19. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Re-referred to Coms. on TRANS. and PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |