Assembly
|
06/02/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 3872.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3788.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
May 9 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 3. Page 3521.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3239.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Set for hearing March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Referral to Com. on HOUSING rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on E.Q., TRANS., and HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|