California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1227 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2022

Amended

Bill August 23, 2022
Bill June 23, 2022
Bill March 15, 2022