Senate | 04/21/2022 | April 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2022 | Set for hearing April 27. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2022 | April 25 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | Set for hearing April 25. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2022 | March 28 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Set for hearing March 28. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Referred to Com. on E.Q. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |