Senate | 05/19/2022 | May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2022 | Set for hearing May 19. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2022 | May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2022 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3517.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Set for hearing April 26. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |