California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1245 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2022

Amended

Bill August 25, 2022
Bill June 29, 2022
Bill May 19, 2022
Bill March 14, 2022