Assembly
|
08/22/2022
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2022
|
Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3862.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3596.) (May 3). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
April 26 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
April 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Set for hearing April 26 in TRANS. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|