LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2021-2022 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1274
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB1274
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2021-2022 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1274
Action History
Senate
04/06/2022
April 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Senate
03/25/2022
Set for hearing April 20.
Senate
03/02/2022
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
Senate
02/22/2022
From printer.
Senate
02/18/2022
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
Senate
02/18/2022
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.