Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2022
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 3873.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3791.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3517.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3239.) (March 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Set for hearing March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|