Assembly
|
06/20/2022
|
June 20 hearing: Heard for testimony only.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2022
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3986.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3791.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3609.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|