California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1305 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 2, 2022

Chaptered

Bill August 15, 2022

Amended

Bill April 19, 2022
Bill March 17, 2022