Senate | 03/22/2022 | April 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Set for hearing April 6. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | March 30 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Set for hearing March 30. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |