California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1338 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 14, 2022

Amended

Bill August 25, 2022
Bill August 15, 2022
Bill June 30, 2022
Bill June 16, 2022
Bill May 19, 2022
Bill April 7, 2022
Bill March 16, 2022