Assembly
|
10/24/2022
|
Returned to Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2022
|
June 21 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2022
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2022
|
Re-referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and HUM. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 3973.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3793.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2022
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 3435.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Set for hearing April 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3348.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Referral to Com. on GOV. & F. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Re-referred to Coms. on ED., HUMAN S., and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|