Senate | 04/26/2022 | April 26 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 1. Page 3520.) | ||
Senate | 04/14/2022 | Set for hearing April 26. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2022 | April 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Set for hearing April 19. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2022 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |