|
06/30/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 74, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2022
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2022
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5626.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2022
|
Referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3702.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3650.) (May 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2022
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|