Senate | 04/27/2022 | April 26 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 5. Page 3522.) | ||
Senate | 03/30/2022 | Set for hearing April 26. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | April 19 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Set for hearing April 19. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |