California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1359 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 13, 2022

Amended

Bill August 23, 2022
Bill June 6, 2022
Bill March 16, 2022