Senate | 04/27/2022 | April 27 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2022 | April 26 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3511.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2022 | Set for hearing April 27 in E. & C.A. pending receipt. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Set for hearing April 26. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | April 5 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Set for hearing April 5. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |