Senate | 03/28/2022 | March 31 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Set for hearing March 31. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Referral to Com. on E.Q. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F., HOUSING, and E.Q. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |