California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1374 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2022

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2022

Amended

Bill August 15, 2022
Bill May 19, 2022
Bill April 18, 2022