Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2022
|
June 20 hearing: Heard for testimony only.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2022
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 3914.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3794.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2022
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3460.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
April 21 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|