Senate | 05/27/2022 | Ordered to inactive file. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2022 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3795.) (May 19). | ||
Senate | 05/17/2022 | Set for hearing May 19. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2022 | May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2022 | Set for hearing May 16. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2022 | May 9 hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2022 | Set for hearing May 9. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3440.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2022 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Set for hearing April 19. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |