California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1396 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2022

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2022

Amended

Bill June 15, 2022
Bill April 21, 2022
Bill March 16, 2022