|
09/15/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 335, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5275.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2022
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2022
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Reyes.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2022
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3647.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2022
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3348.) (April 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|