California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB14 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 7, 2020

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2021

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2021

Amended

Bill August 30, 2021
Bill July 14, 2021
Bill June 17, 2021
Bill May 28, 2021
Bill May 20, 2021
Bill March 18, 2021
Bill March 3, 2021