Senate | 05/19/2022 | May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2022 | Set for hearing May 19. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2022 | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2022 | Set for hearing May 9. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 3515.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2022 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2022 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3457.) (April 20). | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Set for hearing April 26 in JUD. pending receipt. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Set for hearing April 20. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2022 | April 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Set for hearing April 6. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2022 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |