Assembly | 08/25/2022 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes. | ||
Assembly | 06/27/2022 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/27/2022 | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Flora. | ||
Assembly | 06/23/2022 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 06/22/2022 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 22). | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2022 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2022 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2022 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3672.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2022 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2022 | Set for hearing May 9. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 3512.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | Set for hearing April 26. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |