|
09/30/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 888, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 5317.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2022
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2022
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 3875.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3796.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2022
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 3438.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 3349.) (April 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Set for hearing April 19 in JUD. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
Set for hearing April 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|