|
09/30/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 997, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2022
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 14. Page 5996.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2022
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 3824.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3377.) (April 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|