Assembly
|
08/18/2022
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Berman.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Reyes.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/10/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
August 3 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2022
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3358.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2022
|
Set for hearing April 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 3168.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2022
|
Set for hearing March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|