Senate | 05/19/2022 | May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2022 | Set for hearing May 19. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2022 | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2022 | Set for hearing May 9. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 3546.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2022 | Set for hearing April 27. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2022 | April 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/07/2022 | Set for hearing April 18. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |