Senate | 05/19/2022 | May 19 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2022 | Set for hearing May 19. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2022 | April 18 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2022 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2022 | Set for hearing April 18. | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3237.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Set for hearing March 28. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | From printer. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |