Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 5. Noes 12. Page 3969.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3798.) (May 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Set for hearing May 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Set for hearing May 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3510.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
April 25 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2022
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|