|
07/01/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 94, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2022
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2022
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5401.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2022
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3208.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3149.) (March 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Set for hearing March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|