|
09/19/2022
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 451, Statutes of 2022.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2022
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2022
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5341.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2022
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2022
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5927.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2022
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2022
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3555.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3460.) (April 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
April 21 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|