California 2021-2022 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB19 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 7, 2020

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2021

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2021

Amended

Bill August 30, 2021
Bill June 23, 2021
Bill March 16, 2021
Bill March 3, 2021