|
09/30/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 409, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2021
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 2487.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2021
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 21. Page 2777.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2021
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2021
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2021
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2021
|
June 29 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2021
|
Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2021
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 1256.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1178.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
May 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 935.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
(Corrected April 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 778.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2021
|
Re-referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2021
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/08/2020
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/07/2020
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|