Senate | 02/01/2022 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2021 | May 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2021 | Set for hearing May 20. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2021 | April 5 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2021 | Set for hearing April 5. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2021 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2021 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 499.) (March 15). | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Set for hearing March 15. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2021 | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. | ||
Senate | 01/12/2021 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11. | ||
Senate | 01/11/2021 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |