Assembly
|
08/11/2022
|
August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2022
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2022
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2022
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2022
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2820.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2794.) (January 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Set for hearing January 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
May 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2021
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 779.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/08/2020
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/07/2020
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|