Senate | 09/23/2021 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | April 20 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 3. Page 861.) | ||
Senate | 03/26/2021 | Set for hearing April 20. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2021 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/28/2021 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2021 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 12. | ||
Senate | 01/12/2021 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |