|
07/16/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 101, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2021
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2278.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2021
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1059.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 779.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|