|
07/23/2021
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 131, Statutes of 2021.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2021
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/20/2021
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2021
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2021
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2373.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2021
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2021
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2021
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2021
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 611.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2021
|
Set for hearing March 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 479.) (March 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Set for hearing March 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2021
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2021
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2021
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|